MN HF2949 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment insurance program policy and housekeeping changes made, and Unemployment Insurance Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Title
Unemployment insurance program policy and housekeeping changes made, and Unemployment Insurance Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Sponsors
Rep. John Persell [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 251 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-13 | House | Returned from Senate |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 57-0 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2186 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2186, now on General Orders |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-02 | House | Bill was passed vote: 120-0 |
2014-05-02 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 2, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-04-09 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-04-09 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy |