MN HF3224 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education; long-term facility maintenance revenue increase, local optional revenue increased, enhanced debt service equalization aid provided for consolidating school districts, school district property taxes reduced, school formula equalization aid increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Education; long-term facility maintenance revenue increase, local optional revenue increased, enhanced debt service equalization aid provided for consolidating school districts, school district property taxes reduced, school formula equalization aid increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Lippert |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3554 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Authors added Weber; Klein