MN HF3277 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home law codified and extended, common law duty to retreat eliminated for self-defense outside the home, and various other provisions changed.
Title
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home law codified and extended, common law duty to retreat eliminated for self-defense outside the home, and various other provisions changed.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] |
Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] |
Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3657 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy