MN HF3280 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wild rice water findings established and listing authorized, application of water quality standards nullified and restricted, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Wild rice water findings established and listing authorized, application of water quality standards nullified and restricted, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 79 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 78 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 79 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 78 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Governor's action Veto | |
2018-05-09 | Governor veto | |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 38-28 |
2018-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Third reading vote: 38-28 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 79-48 |
2018-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2018-05-07 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2018-05-07 | House | Conference committee report |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate conferees Eichorn, Ingebrigtsen, and Tomassoni. |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate conferees Eichorn; Ingebrigtsen; Tomassoni |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House conferees Lueck; Fabian; Metsa |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-05-02 | House | House conferees Lueck, Fabian, Metsa |
2018-05-02 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-05-02 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-28 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2983 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2983, now on General Orders |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill was passed vote: 78-45 |
2018-04-23 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Amendments offered |
2018-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Ward. |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-05 | House | Authors added Ecklund, Metsa, Sandstede, and Poston. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2983 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3280