MN HF3420 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical examination requirements conformed for commercial driver's license to federal law.
Title
Medical examination requirements conformed for commercial driver's license to federal law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-29 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3091 | |
2010-03-25 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation and Transit Policy and Oversight Division | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |