MN HF3845 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant provisions clarified, and service of summons and complaint modified.
Title
Landlord and tenant provisions clarified, and service of summons and complaint modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3553 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety