MN HF3884 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parental curriculum review provisions modified.
Title
Parental curriculum review provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Bennett and Poston |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Heintzeman |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2575 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Senate file first reading, referred to Education Policy