MN HF4071 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Johnson, C.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Johnson, C.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care business start-up and expansion grants provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Child care business start-up and expansion grants provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
Rep. Clark Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Maye Quade |
2018-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3749 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy