MN HF4541 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety grant funding provided to purchase or upgrade radios and related equipment, and money appropriated.
Title
Public safety grant funding provided to purchase or upgrade radios and related equipment, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4205 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety