MN HF51 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author changed Laine (chief author)
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author changed Laine (chief author)
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health care guaranteed available and affordable for every Minnesotan; Minnesota Health Plan, Minnesota Health Board, Minnesota Health Fund, Office of Health Quality and Planning, ombudsman for patient advocacy, and inspector general for the Minnesota Health Plan established; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Title
Health care guaranteed available and affordable for every Minnesotan; Minnesota Health Plan, Minnesota Health Board, Minnesota Health Fund, Office of Health Quality and Planning, ombudsman for patient advocacy, and inspector general for the Minnesota Health Plan established; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | House | Author changed Laine (chief author) |
2011-01-20 | House | Author added Kahn |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Gauthier, Falk, Hilty, Champion, Hornstein and Slocum |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0051&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF51&version=0&session=ls87 |