MN HF657 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Music education online access for children and students grant program created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Music education online access for children and students grant program created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Winkler |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF321 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Author added Clausen