MN SF321 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Online access to music education for children and students grant program establishment and appropriation
Title
Online access to music education for children and students grant program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Authors added Dahms; Nelson |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF657 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Author added Freiberg