MN HF8 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Authors added Bernardy; Xiong, J.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Authors added Bernardy; Xiong, J.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Family Investment Program (MFIP) onetime supplemental payment funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Family Investment Program (MFIP) onetime supplemental payment funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Authors added Bernardy; Xiong, J. |
2020-06-18 | House | Author added Howard |
2020-06-16 | House | Author added Hassan |
2020-06-15 | House | Authors added Vang |
2020-06-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |