MN HF979 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative task force established to review and prioritize resources to support an aging demographic in the state, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Legislative task force established to review and prioritize resources to support an aging demographic in the state, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Author added Bahner |
2023-02-08 | House | Author stricken Harder |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1022 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration