MN HF997 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State agency civil penalty imposition regulated, and fees and expenses awarded to prevailing parties in actions involving state agencies.
Title
State agency civil penalty imposition regulated, and fees and expenses awarded to prevailing parties in actions involving state agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Doug Wardlow [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Andrea Kieffer [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2011-05-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2011-05-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2011-04-27 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections |
2011-04-14 | House | Author stricken Marquart |
2011-04-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Policy and Finance |
2011-03-10 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2011-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |