MN HF997 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-25 - Author added Murphy, M.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-25 - Author added Murphy, M.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing opportunities made equitable (HOME) pilot project funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing opportunities made equitable (HOME) pilot project funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-25 | House | Author added Murphy, M. |
2015-03-04 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2015-02-19 | House | Author added Ward. |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF282 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - Author stricken Nelson