MN SF1143 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus data practices provisions modification
Title
Omnibus data practices provisions modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 67 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 67 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 290 | |
2012-05-10 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 130-0 |
2012-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-05-07 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-05-07 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-05-07 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 64-1 |
2012-05-07 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Third reading vote: 64-1 |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-25 | House | House conferees Scott, Holberg, Simon |
2012-04-25 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2012-04-25 | House | Senate conferees Limmer; Newman; Hall |
2012-04-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-25 | Senate | House conferees Scott; Holberg; Simon |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate conferees Limmer; Newman; Hall |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-04-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 133-1 |
2012-04-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-17 | House | Amended |
2012-04-17 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 70-64 |
2012-04-17 | House | Motion for reconsideration Mullery amendment |
2012-04-17 | House | Amended |
2012-04-17 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-04-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief author added Limmer |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Ortman |
2012-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-19 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1466 |
2011-05-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 57-0 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |