MN SF1146 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Authors added Draheim; Osmek
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Authors added Draheim; Osmek
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ donor discrimination by a health carrier prohibition; paid leave benefits for living organ donors extension requirements
Title
Organ donor discrimination by a health carrier prohibition; paid leave benefits for living organ donors extension requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Authors added Draheim; Osmek |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Authors stricken Dibble; Kent |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Authors added Dibble; Clausen |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1741 (Similar To) 2020-04-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce