MN SF19 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - HF passed, no substitution HF6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - HF passed, no substitution HF6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus commerce policy and finance
Title
Omnibus commerce policy and finance
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Senate | HF passed, no substitution HF6 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Authors added Senjem; Frentz; Utke; Mathews |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF6 (Similar To) 2021-06-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 4