MN SF2060 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 163 04/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 163 04/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Food licensing law expansion; farmers market definition and food product sampling and demonstration allowance; chili and soup cook-off fund-raiser events food inspection requirements exemption
Title
Food licensing law expansion; farmers market definition and food product sampling and demonstration allowance; chili and soup cook-off fund-raiser events food inspection requirements exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Vicki Jensen [D] | Rep. Bob Barrett [R] | Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Zachary Dorholt [D] | Rep. Patti Fritz [D] | Rep. Joe Radinovich [D] |
Rep. Karen Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 163 04/11/14 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor's action Approval 04/11/14 | |
2014-04-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-04-11 | Governor approval | |
2014-04-10 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third reading vote: 55-0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2014-04-09 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 129-0 |
2014-04-09 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-09 | House | Amended |
2014-04-09 | House | Taken from table |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2014-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-02 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2178 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Special Order: Amended vote: 48-16 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Author added Jensen |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |