MN SF2568 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Orders for protection respondent filing fee requirements elimination
Title
Orders for protection respondent filing fee requirements elimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2553 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with HF2553 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2553 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State Chapter 176