MN SF2744 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Commerce appropriations
Title
Omnibus Commerce appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House: S.F. NO. 2744 (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Laid on table (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - S2744A13 (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: O'Driscoll - Amendment - S2744A3 (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: 59 - Amendment to Daudt Amendment - Nays (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S2744A17 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S2744A16 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: O'Driscoll - Amendment - S2744A6 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Pfarr - Amendment - S2744A12 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Perryman - Amendment - S2744A15 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Laid on table (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - S2744A13 (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: O'Driscoll - Amendment - S2744A3 (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: 59 - Amendment to Daudt Amendment - Nays (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S2744A17 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment - S2744A16 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: O'Driscoll - Amendment - S2744A6 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Pfarr - Amendment - S2744A12 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Perryman - Amendment - S2744A15 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 57 | |
2023-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2023-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2023-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2023-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Laid on table |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Third reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-04-28 | Senate | House conferees Stephenson; Kotyza-Witthuhn; O'Driscoll |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate conferees Klein; Seeberger; Rasmusson |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2023-04-27 | House | House conferees Stephenson, Kotyza-Wittuhn, O'Driscoll |
2023-04-27 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2023-04-27 | House | Senate conferees Klein; Seeberger; Rasmusson |
2023-04-27 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2023-04-27 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended |
2023-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-04-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2023-04-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2680 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means