MN SF3037 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Author added Hauschild
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Author added Hauschild
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ramsey exemption provision for construction materials for a new water treatment plant
Title
Ramsey exemption provision for construction materials for a new water treatment plant
Sponsors
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Heather Gustafson [D] |
Sen. Grant Hauschild [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Author added Hauschild |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Authors added Hoffman; Gustafson |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3104 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Author added Newton