MN SF395 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Orders for Protection Act
Title
Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Orders for Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-03-23 | Governor approval | |
2021-03-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 6 | |
2021-03-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-03-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Third reading |
2021-03-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 18, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-03-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF113 |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF113 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Author added Ecklund