MN SF4091 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-22 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-22 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus jobs, energy and commerce policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus jobs, energy and commerce policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Laid on table (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Mekeland - Amendment - S4091A25 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - S4091A24 (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment S4091A13 - S4091A13 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: - Amendment - S4091A33 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Richardson Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Laid on table (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Mekeland - Amendment - S4091A25 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - S4091A24 (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment S4091A13 - S4091A13 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House: - Amendment - S4091A33 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Richardson Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Senate | Laid on table |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Third reading |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House conferees Noor; Ecklund; Long; Stephenson; Swedzinski |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate conferees Pratt; Rarick; Dahms; Senjem; Frentz |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | House conferees Noor, Ecklund, Long, Stephenson, Swedzinski |
2022-05-05 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate conferees Pratt, Rarick, Dahms, Senjem, Frentz |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-04 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2022-05-04 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2022-05-04 | House | Amended |
2022-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 4, 2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-28 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Author added Rarick |
2022-04-27 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4355 |
2022-04-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Authors added Senjem; Housley |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4355 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - HF indefinitely postponed