MN SF4199 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requirements for the release of patient health records modification
Title
Requirements for the release of patient health records modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3443 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Second reading