MN SF435 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ethanol plants mandatory environmental assessment worksheet requirement modification
Title
Ethanol plants mandatory environmental assessment worksheet requirement modification
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Rod Skoe [D] |
Sen. Keith Langseth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2011-03-21 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |