MN SF444 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House conferees Hoppe, Nash, and Loeffler
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House conferees Hoppe, Nash, and Loeffler
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus liquor bill
Title
Omnibus liquor bill
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 79 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Torkelson Motion to Reconsider Amendment (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Torkelson Motion to Reconsider Amendment (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House conferees Hoppe, Nash, and Loeffler |
2018-02-22 | House | House accedes |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate conferees Dahms, Utke, Tomassoni |
2018-02-22 | House | New conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House conferees Hoppe; Nash; Loeffler |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate conferees Dahms; Utke; Tomassoni |
2018-02-20 | Senate | New conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Taken from table |
2017-05-20 | House | House conferees Hoppe, Nash, Loeffler |
2017-05-20 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate conferees Dahms, Utke, Tomassoni |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-05-20 | Senate | House conferees Hoppe; Nash; Loeffler |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate conferees Dahms; Utke; Tomassoni |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2017-05-18 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 79-54 |
2017-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-05-18 | House | Amended |
2017-05-18 | House | Amendment reconsidered |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion to take from table |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2017-05-15 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF68 |
2017-04-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-9 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF68 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Author added Loeffler.