MN SF516 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Contested case judicial review service on all parties requirement
Title
Contested case judicial review service on all parties requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF1120 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |