MN SF727 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Threshold establishment for accident prevention courses
Title
Threshold establishment for accident prevention courses
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Transportation |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Authors added Frentz; Wiklund |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4587 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger