MN SF810 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Metropolitan area transit services data classification
Title
Metropolitan area transit services data classification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |