MO HB1456 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Health Care Policy (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Health Care Policy (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of members on the MO HealthNet Oversight Committee from 18 to 19 by adding a licensed or registered nurse who cares for participants in the MO HealthNet Program
Title
Increases the number of members on the MO HealthNet Oversight Committee from 18 to 19 by adding a licensed or registered nurse who cares for participants in the MO HealthNet Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1456&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1456I.htm |