MO HB1461 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions regarding the distribution of a controlled substance were enacted to create a safe zone around certain areas and serve as an enhancement of the punishment
Title
Specifies that certain provisions regarding the distribution of a controlled substance were enacted to create a safe zone around certain areas and serve as an enhancement of the punishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Crime Prevention (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-22 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1461&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1461I.htm |