MO HB1500 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Export Incentive Act to encourage foreign trade through international airports in Missouri
Title
Establishes the Missouri Export Incentive Act to encourage foreign trade through international airports in Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1500&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1500I.htm |