MO HB1506 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provision allowing the Board of Probation and Parole to charge an offender an intervention fee
Title
Repeals the provision allowing the Board of Probation and Parole to charge an offender an intervention fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred: Corrections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1506&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1506I.PDF |