MO HB1507 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Homeowners' Solar Rights Act which prohibits entities from restricting the installation of solar energy systems
Title
Establishes the Homeowners' Solar Rights Act which prohibits entities from restricting the installation of solar energy systems
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McNeil [D] | Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1507&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1507I.htm |