MO HB1519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against health care professionals who refuse to assist in medical procedures or treatments relating to sex reassignment or gender identity transitioning
Title
Prohibits discrimination against health care professionals who refuse to assist in medical procedures or treatments relating to sex reassignment or gender identity transitioning
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |