MO HB1557 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1 TO SS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1 TO SS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding traffic regulations including evidence obtained from an automated traffic enforcement system, trucks with a gross weight over 48,000 pounds driving in the far left-hand lane of any Missouri highway, and emergency utility response permits to allow motor carriers to transport equipment following a disaster
Title
Changes the laws regarding traffic regulations including evidence obtained from an automated traffic enforcement system, trucks with a gross weight over 48,000 pounds driving in the far left-hand lane of any Missouri highway, and emergency utility response permits to allow motor carriers to transport equipment following a disaster
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1 TO SS PENDING |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 9:30am, Pershing Gallery |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee (S) - Transportation |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 84 NOES: 63 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 6 ADOPTED |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |