MO HB1577 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws relating to labor organizations
Title
Changes the laws relating to labor organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HCS/HA 2 pending |
2018-05-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-05-02 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |