MO HB1577 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the reporting of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the reporting of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Rep. Keri Ingle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1577&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3016H.01I.pdf |