MO HB1578 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires in-state public educational institutions to grant undergraduate course credit for students who score 4 or higher on international baccalaureate examinations
Title
Requires in-state public educational institutions to grant undergraduate course credit for students who score 4 or higher on international baccalaureate examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |