MO HB1658 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exceptions for the release of public records relating to the death of a law enforcement officer in the line of duty
Title
Creates exceptions for the release of public records relating to the death of a law enforcement officer in the line of duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |