MO HB1687 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of State Route C that crosses over U. S. Highway 79 in Lincoln County as the "LCPL Patrick W. Schimmel Memorial Highway"
Title
Designates the portion of State Route C that crosses over U. S. Highway 79 in Lincoln County as the "LCPL Patrick W. Schimmel Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, 8:00 A.M., SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |