MO HB1717 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred: Special Committee on Education Reform(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred: Special Committee on Education Reform(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides A+ scholarships for home school students who meet the program's eligibility requirements
Title
Provides A+ scholarships for home school students who meet the program's eligibility requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGirl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Education Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |