MO HB1738 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Kansas City to impose an additional court cost of up to $5 for each municipal ordinance violation case to be used for the restoration, maintenance, and upkeep of the municipal courthouse
Title
Allows Kansas City to impose an additional court cost of up to $5 for each municipal ordinance violation case to be used for the restoration, maintenance, and upkeep of the municipal courthouse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1738&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1738I.htm |