MO HB1738 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding water resources
Title
Changes the laws regarding water resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1738 (*HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 57 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 3 and HA 4 adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |