MO HB1826 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an election authority to accept voter registration applications with electronic signatures under certain circumstances
Title
Authorizes an election authority to accept voter registration applications with electronic signatures under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1826&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1826I.PDF |