MO HB1867 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that beginning January 1, 2017, certain shareholders of S corporations may elect to reject workers' compensation insurance coverage
Title
Specifies that beginning January 1, 2017, certain shareholders of S corporations may elect to reject workers' compensation insurance coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House: HB 1867 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations(H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) - Employment Security |
2016-02-24 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Employment Security(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |