MO HB1911 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the responsibility of obtaining background checks on school bus drivers
Title
Changes the laws regarding the responsibility of obtaining background checks on school bus drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-26 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-26 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1911&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1911I.htm |