MO HB1911 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the levy rate for certain bond issues be set at the rate needed to meet the bond issue obligation and may be adjusted solely to meet such obligation
Title
Specifies that the levy rate for certain bond issues be set at the rate needed to meet the bond issue obligation and may be adjusted solely to meet such obligation
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1911&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1911I.PDF |